Trustees CHICHESTER MEDICAL EDUCATION CENTRE
Charity number: 244559

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leigh Simeon Keates | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
NEIL HART | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Martindale | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Weller | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Honor Hinxman | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Hall | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bronwyn Middleton | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Carruthers Johnstone | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Witcomb | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA RIGBY | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neal Robert Gent | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hatef Mansoubi | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Guy Jonathan Charles Harris | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 2001 |
|
|
||||
Dr GRAEME DEWHURST | Trustee | 19 March 1991 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.