Financial history LUDGROVE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 309100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £5.47m £5.10m £5.28m £5.83m £6.08m
Total expenditure £5.03m £4.92m £5.28m £5.72m £6.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £102.27k £113.64k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £20.13k £98.81k £92.67k £90.41k £59.57k
Income - Other trading activities £16.35k £17.24k £8.07k £27.57k £38.56k
Income - Charitable activities £5.42m £4.85m £5.06m £5.69m £5.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.36k £13.24k £2.04k £28.04k £66.63k
Income - Other £1.10k £120.66k £113.64k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.03m £4.89m £5.26m £5.71m £6.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £33.42k £13.79k £18.95k £52.25k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £63.31k £63.31k £72.35k £89.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0