Trustees LUDGROVE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Charity Number: 309100

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Edward Floyd | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charles Edward Rodney Scott-Malden | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Jane Morphet | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Logie Charles Lloyd Fitzwilliams | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Michelle den Besten | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Hinchliff | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Balfour Henshilwood | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|||||
D'Arcy Donna Vigors | Trustee | 09 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Cormack | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alexander Smyth-Osbourne | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES LANGHORNE BUTTERWORTH | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.