Financial history PHILOLOGICAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £59.67k £103.80k £15.45k £33.91k £418.70k
Total expenditure £62.47k £32.45k £59.57k £67.67k £57.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A