Governing document PHILOLOGICAL FOUNDATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22 JULY 1982 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 9 MARCH 1990 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 24 AUGUST 2006. as amended on 04 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
(A) TO AWARD GRANTS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, AND OTHER FINANCIAL BENEFITS TO HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN PUPILS AT ANY SCHOOLS PROVIDING SECONDARY EDUCATION IN THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER OR THE LONDN BOROUGH OF CAMDEN AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THE NEEDS OF FORMER PUPILS OF THE ST. MARYLEBONE GRAMMER SCHOOL AND OTHER BOYS AND YOUNG MEN WHO ARE QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID. (B) IN PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENFITS, INCLUDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, AS SCHOOLS IN THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER AND THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN WHICH ARE COUNTY OR VOLUNTARY OR GRANT MAINTAINED SCHOOLS WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1981 AND IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION. TRUSTEES IN APPLYING INCOME UNDER THIS HEAD SHALL CONSULT WITH THE INNER LONDON EDUCATION AUTHORITY AND THE GOVERNING BODIES OF THE SCHOOLS TO BE BENEFITED, AND SHALL PAY PARTICULAR REGARD TO THE NEEDS OF SCHOOLS IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF ST. MARYLEBONE. (C) IN GIVING EDUCATIONAL PRIZES OR AWARDS TO PUPILS AT SCHOOLS REFERRED TO IN SECTION (B): PROVIDED THAT ANY SINGLE PRIZE OR AWARD SHALL BE LIMITED TO THE OF ú50 IN CASH OR KIND VALUED AS THE THE 1ST JANUARY 1989, SUCH AMOUNT TO BE INCREASED IN THE SAME RATIO THAT THE RETAIL PRICES INDEX AT THE BEGINING OF EACH YEAR BEARS TO THE RETAIL PRICES INDEX AS AT THE 1ST JANUARY 1989; PROVIDED FURTHER THAT THE TOTAL AMOUNT IN ANY YEAR ON SUCH PRIZES OR AWARDS SHALL NOT EXCEED 5 PERCENT. OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE PREVIOUS ACCOUNTING YEAR OF THE CHARITY. (D) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS QUALIFIED UNDER SECTION (A) OF THE SUB-CLAUSE TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT.
Area of benefit
CITY OF WESTMINSTER AND LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.