Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN ON THE CLIFFS, BLACKPOOL

Charity Number: 1131959
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £133.00k £86.20k £108.90k £226.41k £228.68k
Total expenditure £118.00k £103.38k £119.66k £131.94k £351.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.70k £4.90k £1.04k N/A