Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN ON THE CLIFFS, BLACKPOOL
Charity Number: 1131959

Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Lloyd | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Rose | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Rose | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Andrew Cramer | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Mclennan | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
WALTER JOHN CAIRNS | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Stansfield | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith McLennan | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katy Billinghurst | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNY GREEN | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN BUTTERWORTH | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|||||
DOROTHY GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTINE GRIMSTED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY BAYLISS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.