Governing document RICHMOND HOUSE SCHOOL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JULY 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPEC RESO DATED 1 MARCH 1994, CERT OF INCORP ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 MARCH 1994, SPEC RES DATED 27 MARCH 2006 AND CERT OF INCORP ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 5 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 JUL 2024
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF ANY BOARDING AND/OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS INCLUDING NURSERY AND CHILDCARE PROVISION FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN; AND 2. INSOFAR AS IT IS INCIDENTAL OR ANCILLARY TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.