Dogfen lywodraethu MK GALLERY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/09/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8/11/1989, 8/12/1989, 6/2/1990, 12/6/1995 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/01/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07/03/2014 as amended on 20 Sep 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PRODUCTION AND PRESENTATION OF AND ENGAGEMENT WITH THE ARTS, VISUAL CULTURE AND RELATED AREAS OF CREATIVE PRACTICE, AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH PROJECTS AND SCHEMES THEREFORE PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE. TO PRESENT, PROMOTE, ORGANISE, PROVIDE, MANAGE AND PRODUCE A BALANCED PROGRAMME OF ARTISTIC ACTIVITY AND ENDEAVOUR, WHETHER ON ANY PREMISES OF THE COMPANY OR ELSEWHERE, AS ARE CONDUCIVE TO THE PROMOTION, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PUBLIC, AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, VISUAL CULTURE AND RELATED AREAS OF CREATIVE PRACTICE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE MILTON KEYNES AND REGION
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.