Trustees THE SHIPWRECKED FISHERMEN AND MARINERS' ROYAL BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Charity number: 212034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cdr Andrea Crook RN | Chair | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Eleanor Charles | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Claire Harris | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
William John Plant | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Toby Justin Williamson | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cdre Mike Mansergh CBE | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS LIZ PRICE | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROB JARDINE-BROWN | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN GRAHAM PEPPER FNI | Trustee | 20 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
TIM WEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD HENRY COLEMAN FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EAMONN DELANEY KSG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAPTAIN ROGER BARKER MNM FNI | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAPTAIN NIGEL PALMER OBE MNM | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAPTAIN JOHN VERCOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL SEYMOUR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.