Governance DOGS TRUST LEGACY
Charity number: 227523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 07 June 1963: Standard registration
- 19 July 2016: Funds received from 265069 THE TAILWAGGERS CLUB TRUST
- 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
- 09 September 2022: Funds received from 1135472 BLOODHOUND LIFELINE LIMITED
- 02 March 2023: Funds received from 1020917 MICHAEL MAUGHAN CHARITABLE TRUST
- 20 April 2023: Funds received from 1003963 THE EDWARD SHARPLES CHARITABLE TRUST
- 06 March 2024: Funds received from 1083962 SUTTON-IN-ASHFIELD (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- DOGS TRUST (Previous name)
- NCDL (Previous name)
- THE NATIONAL CANINE DEFENCE LEAGUE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.