Dogfen lywodraethu GROUNDWORK NORTH EAST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 28/08/1992, 08/08/1996, 05/10/96, 25/08/2005, 24/05/2006, 10/10/2006 & 08/05/2009. CERT INCORPORATED NAME CHANGE 29/05/2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/02/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON02/04/2011 02/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 MAR 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN THE NORTH EAST AND CUMBRIA REGIONS OF ENGLAND (THE 'AREA'); (2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING IN OR WORKING IN OR RESORTING TO THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (3) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND OTHER WAYS OF BETTER CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME WHERESOEVER; (4 TO PROMOTE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3)
Maes buddion
NORTH EAST AND CUMBRIA AREAS OF ENGLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.