Dogfen lywodraethu LYMPHOMA ACTION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JAN 2018 as amended on 10 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING BY PERSONS WITH LYMPHOMAS AND OTHER BLOOD CANCERS BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, PSYCHOLOGICAL SUPPORT AND TREATMENT 2) THE PROMOTION, FUNDING AND PUBLICATION OF RESEARCH INTO LYMPHOMAS AND OTHER BLOOD CANCERS, INCLUDING THE CAUSES, THE TREATMENTS AND TREATMENT OUTCOMES 3) ACTIVITIES TO RAISE THE AWARENESS OF LYMPHOMAS AND OTHER BLOOD CANCERS, TO ENCOURAGE THE ALLOCATION OF RESOURCES TO THEIR TREATMENT AND RESEARCH AND TO ALLOW MORE PEOPLE TO ACCESS THE LYMPHOMA ASSOCIATION'S SERVICES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.