Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS (NASEN)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/12/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 SEP 2018 as amended on 15 Dec 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION, TRAINING, ADVANCEMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND CARE OF ALL INFANTS, CHILDREN, YOUNG PERSONS AND OTHERS OF WHATEVER AGE WITH LEARNING DIFFERENCES BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PROVIDING RELEVANT INFORMATION, TRAINING AND RESOURCES TO EDUCATION PROFESSIONALS WHO WORK WITH SUCH PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE, THE UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.