Dogfen lywodraethu KEW COLLEGE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 NOV 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 JUL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 FEB 2005 as amended on 10 Feb 2020 as amended on 13 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the Charity are the advancement of education for the public benefit in particular without limitation by: a) maintaining, carrying on, managing and developing Kew College at Kew, Surrey; and b) acquiring, establishing, maintaining, carrying on, managing and developing, funding and/or supporting such other schools and educational activities; as the trustees shall from time to time think fit (the “Objects”).
Maes buddion
KEW AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.