Trustees PURBECK UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1075342
Charity reporting is up to date (72 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vanessa Johnson | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony Kelpie | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Lynch | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Fielder | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Fuller | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Jones | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Griffin | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Kerridge | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.