Governing document PURBECK UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 2005, 24 JULY 2008 AND 13 MAY 2010. AS AMENDED ON 25 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE IN PURBECK, DORSET AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY WHO ARE NO LONGER IN FULL-TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
PURBECK, DORSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.