Trustees POOR'S ESTATE
Charity number: 200640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD WILLIAM WALDEGRAVE PC | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Dr Rosalind Rivaz | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Yvonne Olney | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Peter John McKee | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Jane Reed | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Blightman | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Marie Maher | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
REV Rosalind Ruth La Stacey | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
George Fussey | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Derek Bishop | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||
DOUGLAS HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PHILIP HIGHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SUSAN WARNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PAMELA BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.