POOR'S ESTATE

Charity number: 200640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Blightman Trustee 01 February 2017 None on record
LORD WILLIAM WALDEGRAVE PC Chair None on record
Marie Hoadley Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
DOUGLAS HILL Trustee None on record
REV Rosalind Ruth La Stacey Trustee 22 September 2014
ETON PARISH EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
Derek Bishop Trustee 04 February 2013 None on record
DR A L H GAILEY CVO Trustee
THE GLEN BEG FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE PRINCE PHILIP TRUST FUND Received: On time
PHILIP HIGHY Trustee
THE LONDON AND SLOUGH RUN Received: On time
Jane Reed Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
George Fussey Trustee 16 September 2013 None on record
PAMELA BAKER Trustee None on record
SUSAN WARNER Trustee None on record