Governing document SRI GURU SINGH SABHA SOUTHALL
Charity number: 280707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 APR 1970 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 1979 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCT 1993 AS AMENDED ON 17 NOV 1996 AS AMENDED ON 07 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED ON 18 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNDEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.