Financial history SRI GURU SINGH SABHA SOUTHALL

Charity number: 280707
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.11m £3.13m £3.38m £2.37m £3.56m
Total expenditure £2.18m £2.54m £2.60m £1.81m £2.54m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £196.62k £140.64k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.04m £3.06m £3.33m £2.17m £3.37m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £140.64k
Income - Charitable activities £74.78k £74.77k £51.90k £0 £58.03k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £196.62k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.18m £2.54m £2.60m £1.81m £2.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £124.54k £58.05k £92.12k £10.53k £8.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0