Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PANCRAS AND ST JOHN, CHICHESTER
Charity number: 1137043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE REVD CANON MARK JAMES TOWNSEND PAYNE | Chair | 09 May 2011 |
|
|||||
Teresa Evelyn Mocatta | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Haynes | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JOHN MUMFORD | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Sedgwick Watts | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Mary Codner | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharyl Mary Bowers | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Condron | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Gregson Morgan | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DERRICK John TYLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL DARBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA JOAN DARBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.