Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW'S WESTMINSTER
Charity number: 1132355
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Preb Philip Anthony Edwin Chester | Chair |
|
||||||||
Craig Shenton Mr | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel Johnson | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Muriel Adele Yvette Zagha-Shore | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Stephen Hewitt | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jacintha Chawda | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Frances Jessica Streeting Mrs | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Alastair Callcutt | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev MICHAEL SKINNER | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
RAY MINGAY | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Lello | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
EITHNE RISNER | Trustee | 05 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN MARY LOWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JANE LOUISE KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev Peter Louis Hanaway | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JONATHAN WILLIAM PATRICK AITKEN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.