Trustees CHALFONTS U3A
Charity number: 1168664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Barker | Chair | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Krushner | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Green | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Hillis | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Robert Barker | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Hardwick | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Clegg | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Martin Tomlin | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth White | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Margaret Bedford | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Powell | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.