Trustees BOLTON NEURO VOICES
Charity number: 1178772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIE OXTOBY | Chair | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chimanbhai Tailor | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Alan Lyons | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chas Andrew | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Margaret Delaney | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Germaine | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marie BOARDMAN | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE MARIE STUART | Trustee | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MOYRA MCDERMOTT | Trustee | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.