Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER BROCKLEY
Charity number: 1180277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Mark Jones | Chair | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stormont | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joel Soares | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joel Power | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Salome Ajayi | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nita Rogers | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Parnham | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Pellew | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Allen | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chistopher Harvey | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE SUSAN WILKINSON | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Colin Richard Plant | Trustee | 19 April 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.