THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER BROCKLEY

Charity number: 1180277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel Carr Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Alice Margaret Toms Trustee 26 April 2019 None on record
SYLVIA YVONNE RICHARDS Trustee 15 April 2006 None on record
Colin Richard Plant Trustee 19 April 2009
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
Elizabeth Jane Henriette Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
LYNNE SUSAN WILKINSON Trustee 15 May 2015 None on record
Harneck Chilemba Trustee 20 April 2019
The African People's Historical Monument Foundation (Black Cultural Archives) Limited Received: On time
Christopher Lawson Jones Trustee 22 May 2019 None on record
Helen Elizabeth Power Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Aideen Clare Johnston Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Chistopher Harvey Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
Fidelis Wanjik Wheeler Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
BENJAMIN MARK JONES Chair 11 June 2018 None on record