Trustees NATIONAL EMERGENCIES TRUST
Charity number: 1182809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BARRADELL OBE | Chair | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Clark | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Ralph Throp | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin John Griffiths | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dalton Leong | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
THELMA STOBER | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ashley John Head | Trustee | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
GERALD ERNEST OPPENHEIM | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Ian Beeforth OBE | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.