NATIONAL EMERGENCIES TRUST

Charity number: 1182809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jhumar Johnson Trustee 01 March 2021 None on record
Elizabeth Balgobin Trustee 01 March 2021 None on record
Louise Wilson Trustee 01 March 2021 None on record
THELMA STOBER Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
Gordon Henry Tempest-Hay Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
GENERAL THE LORD FRANCIS RICHARD DANNATT GCBCBEMCDL Chair 25 March 2019
THE NORMANDY MEMORIAL TRUST LTD Received: On time
GERALD ERNEST OPPENHEIM Trustee 21 March 2019
LONDON EMERGENCIES TRUST Received: On time
JOHN BARRADELL OBE Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
Ashley John Head Trustee 05 July 2019
THE BOXING ACADEMY FOUNDATION Received: 5 days late
Dalton Leong Trustee 01 March 2021 None on record
Andrew Ian Beeforth OBE Trustee 14 January 2019 None on record
Dr Benjamin John Griffiths Trustee 04 October 2021 None on record