Trustees 1ST DOWNTON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1183184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Cornell | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Porter | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hurst | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edwards | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Kynaston | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Hill | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ullyatt | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.