Trustees NORTHAMPTONSHIRE SPORT
Charity number: 1184107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Peter Jones | Chair | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Bliss FCIPD | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ferguson | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Chapman MA, ACA | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MANDY YOUNG | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cristina Taboada-Naya | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Imran Ahmed Chowdhury BEM | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Reemesh Vinod Patel | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Susan Purnell MA | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Brian North | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.