Trustees NORTHAMPTONSHIRE SPORT

Charity number: 1184107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEVEN PAUL ADAMS Chair 26 June 2019
UNITY LEISURE
Received: On time
Northants Community Aid
Received: On time
Adam William Brown Trustee 15 March 2022
THE NORTHAMPTON THEATRES TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Reemesh Vinod Patel Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
Shereen Ingram Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
Marc Pettican Trustee 19 January 2021
None on record
Kerry Susan Purnell MA Trustee 12 May 2020
None on record
Dr Peter Jones Trustee 26 June 2019
UNITY LEISURE
Received: On time
Steven John Brian North Trustee 26 June 2019
None on record
Lucy Wightman Trustee 26 June 2019
None on record