Trustees TOURING EXHIBITIONS GROUP
Charity number: 1191056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Felicity Laura Sylvester | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Calum John MacGillivray | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Bethan Lobb | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ulrike Smalley | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alanna Maria Davidson | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Claire Stacey | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Morton | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elena May Saggers | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Daker | Trustee | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.