Trustees WAKEFIELD HOSPICE
Charity number: 518392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jo-Anne Charalambous | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Perminderjeet Kaur Banwait | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Denise Bateman | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Kendall | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Gait | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brandon Ralph | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ROBERT BECK | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GORDON MILNE | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Bebhinn Clare Therese BROWNE | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Emma CLAYTON | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Otter | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Thomas Hamilton | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Hirst | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Navkirnjot Bains-Williams | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Ashton | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.