Governing document VOLUNTEER AND CONTACT ASSOCIATION (LINCOLN MENTAL HEALTH)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 9 MAY 1975 AS AMENDED 10 FEBRUARY 1988, 7 NOVEMBER 1988,26 APRIL 1989 AND 22 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS WITH A MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEM.1.BY SEEKING TO ENCOURAGE,FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PROVISION OF PERSONAL FRIENDSHIPS,RECRUITING VOLUNTEERS AND STIMULATING INTEREST AND INVOLVEMENT WITH PEOPLE WITH AN INTEREST IN MENTAL HEALTH.2.BY ENCOURAGING SOCIAL INTERACTION AND EXCHANGE OF IDEAS BETWEEN PEOPLE WITH AN INTEREST IN MENTAL HEALTH AND THE COMMUNITY.3.BY CO-OPERATING WITH OTHER BODIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WITH AN INTEREST IN MENTAL HEALTH.4.TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO THOSE PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF CARING FOR A PERSON WITH A MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEM ARE LEADING A RESTRICTED LIFE AND ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.