Trustees VOLUNTEER AND CONTACT ASSOCIATION (LINCOLN MENTAL HEALTH)
Charity number: 701381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Edwin Boltz | Chair | 04 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Boltz | Trustee | 08 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Caldwell | Trustee | 28 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Lillie | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA TERESA BROWN | Trustee | 07 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Helen Maddison | Trustee | 06 June 1990 |
|
|
||||
Martin Brown | Trustee | 06 June 1985 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.