Trustees KENNET COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Charity number: 1000057
Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Joseph Thorpe | Chair | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Tatam | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Halls | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adam Pensotti | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kym Marie Cleasby | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paula Emily Heard | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Wolfenden | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR JEREMY HUMFREY HUTTON YORK - RETIRED MBE BA | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARCIA JOAN JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.