AL - HILAL ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1000316
Charity reporting is overdue by 1686 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 225 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 225 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 591 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 591 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 956 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 956 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1321 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1321 days
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1686 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1686 days