Trustees FREEDOM FROM TORTURE
Charity number: 1000340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela CLUFF | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
PHILOMENE UWAMALIYA | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
John Dunford | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
SHABNAM AMINI | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
BRIAN GARETH DUNLOP | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
MAHESH WICKRAMASINGHE | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
RASHA OBAID | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Manraj SANDHU | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
DR FIONA GOUDIE | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
DR MICHAEL ALWYN JOHNSON | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.