Trustees IRISH TRACTION GROUP
Charity number: 1000382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH MANTO | Chair | 07 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
FIACHNA MAC MURCHU | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BECKETT | Trustee | 06 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
INNIS NIALL MENNIE | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
BOB TWIGG | Trustee | 07 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MURPHY | Trustee | 07 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
Dr AIDAN KEHOE | Trustee | 17 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
AIDAN BROSNAN | Trustee | 16 November 2003 |
|
|
||||
PETER JONES | Trustee | 04 June 1989 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.