Financial history ST GREGORIOS INDIAN (MALAN KARA) ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity number: 1000423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £229.21k £249.70k £228.46k £130.00k £150.37k
Total expenditure £194.41k £245.10k £222.27k £114.00k £145.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A