Financial history THE SALVATION ARMY INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1000566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £56.44m £65.24m £69.65m £53.44m £56.87m
Total expenditure £43.99m £49.09m £52.07m £52.97m £57.66m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £51.86m £59.35m £62.99m £43.02m £47.98m
Income - Other trading activities £201.00k £279.00k £570.00k £1.49m £1.17m
Income - Charitable activities £766.00k £676.00k £669.00k £769.00k £355.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.60m £4.08m £5.31m £8.16m £7.24m
Income - Other £17.00k £863.00k £109.00k £0 £122.00k
Income - Legacies £41.00k £25.00k £40.00k £759.00k £144.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £42.90m £47.76m £48.79m £46.47m £51.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.09m £1.33m £3.29m £6.50m £6.65m
Expenditure - Governance £829.00k £1.49m £1.85m £1.86m £1.35m
Expenditure - Grants institution £25.13m £25.73m £25.28m £21.78m £29.24m
Expenditure - Investment management £429.00k £618.00k £749.00k £852.00k £901.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0