RICHMOND AND DALES TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 1000600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required