Accounts and annual returns THE BOSUN AND MARY BUCKWELL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1000622
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021
Annual return 05 April 2020
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020
Annual return 05 April 2019
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019
Annual return 05 April 2018
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018
Annual return 05 April 2017
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017