Financial history THE OILY CART COMPANY

Charity number: 1000799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £646.32k £634.29k £618.64k £477.92k £516.34k
Total expenditure £628.11k £794.76k £531.64k £493.73k £531.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £297.08k £297.08k £297.08k £307.22k £302.65k
Income - Donations and legacies £471.94k £372.63k £519.38k N/A £433.44k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £173.44k £255.38k £94.90k N/A £78.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £103 £2.07k £928 N/A £277
Income - Other £3.84k £4.22k £3.43k N/A £4.15k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £628.11k £712.18k £530.64k N/A £527.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £2.33k £1.00k N/A £4.60k
Expenditure - Governance £5.33k £0 £4.25k N/A £5.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £80.26k £0 N/A £0