Governing document ST KATHARINE AND SHADWELL TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 NOVEMBER 1990, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 JANUARY 1991, 28 APRIL 1992, 11 MAY 1995, 26 MAY 1999, 28 JULY 2004, 9 DEC 2005, 25 APRIL 2006, 30 JULY 2007, 20 OCT 2008 AND 3 FEB 2009
Charitable objects
3.1) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING (INCLUDING TRAINING IN EMPLOYMENT SKILLS) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFIT AREA; 3.2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFIT AREA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION IN LIFE; 3.3) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN THE BENEFIT AREA; 3.4) TO ADVANCE IN THE BENEFIT AREA PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS; 3.5) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF NEEDY PERSONS OR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HANDICAP WITHIN THE BENEFIT AREA ON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 3.6) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE BENEFIT AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 3.7) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN THE BENEFIT AREA BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS; OR II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; B) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES; C) THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; D) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; E) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDING SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; F) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; G) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; H) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; I) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN APPROVAL OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND & WALES; 3.8) TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE BOARD OF GOVERNORS BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE IN THE BENEFIT AREA 3.9) TO MAKE CONTRIBUTIONS TO ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS ASSOCIATIONS, BODIES OR CORPORATIONS FROM TIME TO TIME IN EXISTENCE HAVING AS, OR AMONG, THEIR OBJECTS ANY SIMILAR OBJECTS TO THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
ST KATHARINE,SHADWELL WARDS LONDON BOROUGHS OF TOWER HAMLETS, HACKNEY, NEWHAM AND THE CITY OF LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.