Financial history FREEWHEELERS EMERGENCY VOLUNTARY SERVICE (WESTON)

Charity number: 1001067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £153.28k £181.35k £196.03k £260.63k £71.69k
Total expenditure £76.91k £109.72k £123.40k £151.68k £142.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A