FAITH HOUSE BEVERLEY ROAD FUND

Charity number: 1001123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 September 2019 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 06 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required