Financial history MINETY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1001207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022
Total gross income £13.34k £20.01k £11.84k £26.34k £13.04k
Total expenditure £10.90k £18.81k £5.94k £8.45k £7.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.00k £20.53k £2.67k