Financial history THE FRIENDS OF NEWPORT GIRLS HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1001292
Charity reporting is overdue by 138 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £12.01k £8.37k £4.88k £5.12k £2.76k
Total expenditure £2.60k £7.00k £7.00k £0 £19.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A